Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ji'Aire Lee Workgroup on the Protection of Adults With Mental Illness and Their Children
Sponsored by
Charles County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Human Resources, in collaboration with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, to convene the Ji'Aire Lee Workgroup on the Protection of Adults With Mental Illness and Their Children; requiring the Workgroup to evaluate and determine whether modifications are needed to specified laws, systems, and services; requiring the Department to report the findings of the Workgroup to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2016; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM