Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsored by
Delegates Beidle, Niemann, Bobo, Carr, Frush, Glenn, Healey, Holmes, S. Robinson, Stein, and Weir
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Creating the State Board of Common Ownership Community Managers in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation; providing for the composition of the Board and the appointment, terms, and expenses of the Board members; providing that the Act does not prohibit specified persons from providing services under specified circumstances; requiring an individual to be issued a license by the Board before providing management services for a common ownership community under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0794
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {960018/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-35)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {960018/1 Report Adopted 40
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
House 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (103-35) 42
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 41
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-101 through 22-802 )
(   2-106.10, 2-106.9, 2-108 )
(   11-130.1, 11B-115.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM