Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates - Vehicle Manufactured Without Means to Display Front Plate
Sponsored by
Delegates Elliott, Cullison, Dwyer, Frank, Frush, George, Glass, Impallaria, Kach, Krebs, McConkey, Murphy, O'Donnell, Ready, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, and Vitale
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing, for a vehicle required to display two registration plates, that the front registration plate may be stored inside the vehicle in a specified manner if the vehicle was manufactured without a means to secure and display a front plate; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-411 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM