Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Veterans' Organizations - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Use of Proceeds
Sponsored by
Delegates Elliott, Afzali, Beitzel, Clagett, DeBoy, Fisher, Frank, Hough, James, Jameson, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McConkey, McDonough, Minnick, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, Szeliga, Weir, Wilson, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the allocation of proceeds from instant ticket lottery machines operated by veterans' organizations in specified counties; requiring that at least one-half of the net after-payout proceeds be used to benefit a charity and the remainder of the proceeds to further the purposes of the veterans' organization; repealing a prohibition against using receipts from the sale of tickets from instant ticket lottery machines for a specified purpose under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-112, 9-120, 9-913 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM