Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Authority - Enforcement of Local Minimum Wage Laws
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Barkley, Fraser-Hidalgo, A. Miller, Simmons, and Valderrama
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to enforce a local minimum wage law; specifying that the Commissioner has the same powers and duties in enforcing a local minimum wage law as the Commissioner has to enforce specified provisions of State law; authorizing the Commissioner, on the Commissioner's own initiative or on receipt of a written complaint, to investigate whether a local minimum wage law has been violated; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-43)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {473421/1 Rejected (13-34)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/28/2014 1/29/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed 48A
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (94-43) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {473421/1 Rejected (13-34) 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 62
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-102, 3-103, 3-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM