Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Fueling Stations - Electric Vehicle Charging and Natural Gas Vehicle Refueling Equipment
Sponsored by
Delegates Parrott, Anderton, Cassilly, Folden, Glass, Hornberger, Malone, Morgan, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing specified retail service station dealers a credit against the State income tax for any expense incurred for the installation of equipment necessary to offer recharging or refueling services to electric or natural gas vehicles; providing that the credit may not exceed $20,000; making the credit refundable; requiring the Comptroller to adopt regulations to provide for the administration of the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Fueling Stations - Electric Vehicle Charging and Natural Gas Vehicle Refueling Equipment
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM