Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Shipment - Kosher or Sacramental Wine Sold at Retail
Sponsored by
Delegates Arora, Afzali, Aumann, Barnes, Barve, Beitzel, Boteler, Braveboy, Cardin, Carr, Carter, Cluster, Conaway, Cullison, DeBoy, Dumais, Dwyer, Feldman, Frick, Frush, George, Gilchrist, Glass, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hixson, Holmes, Hough, Howard, Hucker, Impallaria, Ivey, Jacobs, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kipke, Kramer, Krebs, Lee, Luedtke, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McMillan, A. Miller, Mizeur, Morhaim, Myers, O'Donnell, Otto, Parrott, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Schulz, Serafini, Simmons, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Stein, Stukes, Summers, Szeliga, Tarrant, F. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vitale, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilson, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the qualifications of an applicant for a direct wine shipper's permit to include a person licensed by the State or licensed outside the State to engage in the retail sale of wine for consumption off the premises, subject to a specified provision of law; limiting the use of a direct wine shipper's permit by specified persons to the shipment to a consumer in the State of specified kosher wine or sacramental wine; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7.5-103, 7.5-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM