Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Reporting of Precinct Results
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Barkley, Beidle, Bohanan, Carr, Carter, DeBoy, Dwyer, Glenn, Guzzone, Hogan, Lafferty, B. Robinson, Schulz, Sophocleus, Szeliga, V. Turner, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a local board of canvassers to prepare a statement of election results by precinct that includes all votes cast by voters registered in each precinct who voted early on specified voting machines; and requiring the State Board of Elections to prepare a report that includes election results by precinct of all votes cast by voters registered in each precinct who voted early on specified voting machines.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {605768/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {605768/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 47
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-402 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM