Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Delegates Atterbeary, Barve, Clippinger, D.E. Davis, Fennell, Gaines, Hettleman, Hill, Kelly, Sample-Hughes, Stein, Valentino-Smith, and Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a student loan servicer from employing any scheme, device, or artifice to mislead a student loan borrower; prohibiting a student loan servicer from engaging in any unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice; prohibiting a student loan servicer from knowingly misapplying or refusing to correct a misapplication of payments; requiring a student loan servicer to respond to an inquiry within 30 days of receiving the inquiry or complaint; authorizing the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to enforce the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0670
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843499/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-32)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
House 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/26/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {843499/1 Adopted 53A
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (105-32) 54
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Referred Rules 56
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Text - Chapter - Financial Institutions - Student Loan Servicers - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-601 through 26-604 )
(   11-610, 2-104.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM