Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates S. Robinson, Carr, Clippinger, Gilchrist, Kelly, Korman, A. Miller, Moon, Pendergrass, Platt, and Jalisi
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task Force; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to identify, evaluate, study, and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its final findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2017; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1081 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {730310/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-10)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {730310/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (125-10) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM