Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by Counties
Sponsored by
Delegates W. Miller, Afzali, Anderton, Arentz, Aumann, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Carey, Clippinger, Cluster, Folden, Frick, Ghrist, Glass, Grammer, S. Howard, Impallaria, Jameson, Kittleman, Kramer, Lisanti, Mautz, McConkey, Metzgar, A. Miller, Morgan, Oaks, Otto, Pena-Melnyk, Rey, Rose, Sanchez, Turner, Valderrama, B. Wilson, C. Wilson, and Wivell
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, under specified circumstances, a county from requiring a mobile food service facility to obtain a license from the county in order to operate in the county; authorizing a county to inspect a mobile food service facility that is operating in the county; requiring, under specified circumstances, a county to forward the result of a specified inspection to the county that licenses a specified mobile food service facility; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0291
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM