Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 5/28/2020 3:23:35 PM
Thursday, May 28, 2020
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 5/26/2020 9:55 AM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Briefing by the Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Joint with the Ways and Means Committee

Created: 5/27/2020 2:55 AM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
This is a virtual briefing. You can watch a livestream of this meeting here.
Virtual Briefing: The Judicial System During the COVID-19 Pandemic
Including Presentations by: the Maryland Judiciary, Maryland State Bar Association, Maryland State's Attorney's Assocation, and Office of the Public Defender

Created: 5/21/2020 5:42 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting

Other
Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Created: 5/19/2020 1:08 PM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Webex-Teleconference
This meeting will be held through webex-teleconference only. To join by phone dial: 1-415-655-0001. Access Code: 613 898 185
To join online:
1. Go to https://mdhealth.webex.com/mdhealth/k2/j.php?MTID=tbe8c61f334bfdc839c11b0b1e6c1fd09
2. Enter your name and address
3. Enter the session password: AByDsYiP359
4. Click "Join Now"
5. Follow the instructions that appear on your screen - PLEASE INSERT YOUR FULL NAME FOR EASIER IDENTIFICATION PURPOSES

Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities, Oversight Committee on
Created: 5/21/2020 3:42 PM
1:30 PM to 3:30 PM - Conference Call
Join with Google Meet
General Meeting
Call in Phone Number: +1-240-437-4299
PIN: 424 439 088#