Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Lead Remediation and Recovery Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Ali, Anderson, Clippinger, Conaway, Frush, Gibson, Glenn, Hayes, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, Rosenberg, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the Act applies only to an action against a certain manufacturer of lead pigment for certain damages allegedly caused by the presence of lead-based paint in a residential building located in Baltimore City; providing that the Act does not apply to certain actions for certain damages arising from personal injury or death, to certain actions against a person other than a manufacturer, or to certain actions brought by a person other than the City of Baltimore, the Housing Authority of Baltimore City, or a certain owner; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City Lead Remediation and Recovery Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Judiciary
Text - First - Baltimore City Lead Remediation and Recovery Act
House 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2101 through 3-2106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM