Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegates Forbes, Acevero, Bagnall, B. Barnes, Barve, Boyce, Brooks, Cardin, Carr, Chang, Crosby, Cullison, Ebersole, Feldmark, Ghrist, Guyton, Haynes, Henson, Hettleman, Ivey, C. Jackson, Kerr, Kittleman, Korman, Krimm, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lopez, Mosby, Solomon, Stein, Terrasa, Valentino-Smith, C. Watson, Wells, and P. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 272
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped to be the Maryland Library for the Blind and Print Disabled; and altering the appointed membership of the Maryland State Library Board to include a blind patron of the Maryland Library for the Blind and Print Disabled.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0326
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 272
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 272
Text - Chapter - State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
(   11-901, 11-902, 23-101, 23-106, 23-107, 23-205 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:57 PM
Click to return on the top page