Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsored by
Delegate Clagett
Status
In the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the policy of the State on public-private partnerships; altering provisions of law relating to public-private partnerships; establishing that the Court of Special Appeals has jurisdiction over specified immediate appeals related to specified public-private partnerships; authorizing a reporting agency to establish a public-private partnership and execute an agreement in connection with any public infrastructure asset; requiring a reporting agency to adopt regulations and establish processes; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0576 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters and Appropriations
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/31/2013 Text - First - Public-Private Partnerships
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10A-101, 10A-102, 10A-102 through 10A-105, 10A-201 through 10A-204, 10A-301, 10A-401 through 10A-404, 11-203 )
(   4-205, 4-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM