Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student Data Privacy Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, Barkley, Barnes, Bates, Carr, Clagett, Fraser-Hidalgo, Glenn, Guzzone, Healey, Lafferty, Luedtke, McIntosh, Pendergrass, Valentino-Smith, Zucker, Ivey, Stukes, F. Turner, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, on or before December 31, 2014, to consult with specified experts on issues relating to student data privacy, establish parameters for using a specified software service, and develop sample contracts if a local education agency decides to use a software service for specified tasks; requiring specified local education agencies to use a specified sample contract for specified contracts entered into on or after March 31, 2015; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {485160/3 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (52-74)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {973221/1 Rejected (50-79)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {763221/1
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {763221/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {503321/1 Rejected (46-91)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-5)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {485160/3 Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (52-74) 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) {973221/1 Rejected (50-79) 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {763221/1 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {763221/1 Withdrawn 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {503321/1 Rejected (46-91) 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-5) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 61
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Hearing 4/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM