Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officer - Misdemeanor - Hearing and Emergency Suspension
Sponsored by
Delegate Anderson (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a law enforcement officer who has been convicted of a misdemeanor with a potential for more than 1 year imprisonment is not entitled to a specified hearing on specified issues by a hearing board; and providing that, if a law enforcement officer is charged with a misdemeanor with a potential for more than 1 year imprisonment, the chief may impose an emergency suspension of police powers without pay.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-107, 3-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM