Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environmentally Preferable Procurement - Maryland Green Purchasing Committee
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - General Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Maryland Green Purchasing Committee; requiring the Committee to develop and publish, and State units thereafter to adopt, specifications that will enable implementation of environmentally preferable purchasing; altering requirements concerning State unit reporting of recycled content materials; defining "environmentally preferable product or service"; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {736685/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable with Amendments {736685/1 Report Adopted 45
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 45
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2014 3/21/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM