Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rules of Interpretation - Interpretation of "Physician" - Inclusion of Advanced Practice Nurse and Physician Assistant
Sponsored by
Delegates Nathan-Pulliam, Eckardt, Elliott, Hubbard, Jones, A. Kelly, Krebs, Murphy, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Reznik, Tarrant, and V. Turner
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that, under specified circumstances, the term "physician" include an "advanced practice nurse" and a "physician assistant"; prohibiting, under specified circumstances, a requirement for additional authorization of a unit of State government to endorse a document under the application of a specified provision of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2013 3/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM