Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Child Care - Registration Requirements for Participants in Maryland Child Care Subsidy Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Barkley, Carr, Clippinger, Dumais, Frush, Hixson, Kaiser, Korman, Lam, Lierman, Moon, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, B. Robinson, Sample-Hughes, Tarlau, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a family child care home that participates in the Maryland Child Care Subsidy Program to register with the State Department of Education and comply with specified regulations concerning registration; and altering a specified definition of "family child care provider".
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0487
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-550, 5-552, 5-595 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM