Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Use of Pesticides by Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-19
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to provide that a certain provision of the Constitution requiring uniformity of assessments of certain property for property tax purposes does not apply to country clubs or golf courses in Montgomery County under certain circumstances; requiring a country club or golf course in Montgomery County to comply with certain county pesticide laws in order to be eligible for a special use assessment for property tax purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Use of Pesticides by Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-19
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-212, 8-213 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM