Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Delegates Metzgar, Arentz, Aumann, Bromwell, Brooks, Cluster, Ebersole, Folden, Grammer, Gutierrez, Hettleman, Hill, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jalisi, Kittleman, Krebs, Lafferty, Lam, Long, Malone, McComas, McDonough, McKay, Miele, W. Miller, Morhaim, Reilly, Saab, Shoemaker, Stein, Sydnor, Szeliga, West, Wivell, and P. Young
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "eligible individual" by requiring that an elderly individual must live in the same county, rather than the same dwelling, for at least the preceding 40 years to be eligible for a specified statewide optional property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2017.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans - Eligibility
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM