Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans
Sponsored by
Delegates Metzgar, Afzali, Glass, McDonough, Reilly, Simonaire, Szeliga, West, Hixson, Turner, Kaiser, Luedtke, Walker, D. Barnes, Buckel, Fennell, Hornberger, C. Howard, Long, Patterson, Shoemaker, and Tarlau
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City, a county, or a municipal corporation to provide a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on the dwelling of specified individuals who are elderly or veterans; providing for a tax credit that may not exceed 20% of the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on the property to be granted for a period of up to 5 years; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30,2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {415867/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Walker)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {395163/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable with Amendments {415867/1 Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/17/2015 Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Walker) 49
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Favorable with Amendments {395163/1 Report Adopted 51
House 3/23/2015 3/21/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
House 3/24/2015 3/22/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 52
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 49
Senate 3/30/2015 3/30/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM