Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Blue Ribbon Commission to Study Maryland's Behavioral Health System
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Angel, Barron, Beidle, Bromwell, Campos, Carr, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, McMillan, Miele, Morhaim, Oaks, Reznik, B. Robinson, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Sophocleus, Tarlau, C. Wilson, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Blue Ribbon Commission to Study Maryland's Behavioral Health System; providing for the composition, chair, staffing, and duties of the Commission; requiring, to the extent practicable, that the membership of the Commission reflect the geographic, racial, ethnic, cultural, and gender diversity of the State; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0281
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM