Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (The Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Bagnall, Brooks, Carr, Kipke, Krebs, R. Lewis, Moon, Solomon, Terrasa, Barron, Bhandari, Charles, Chisholm, Cullison, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reilly, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, and Szeliga
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets certain requirements to administer a maintenance injectable medication to a patient under certain circumstances; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, by September 1, 2021, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians and the State Board of Nursing, to adopt regulations establishing standard procedures for approving classes of maintenance injectable medications and requiring pharmacists to complete a certain training program in order to administer a maintenance injectable medication; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0545
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {106780/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacists - Administration of Self-Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable with Amendments {106780/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pharmacists – Administration of Self–Administered Medications and Maintenance Injectable Medications (The Christopher King Access to Treatment Act)
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Finance 43 Click to view Recorded Media
(   12-101, 12-509 )
(   15-716 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:00 PM
Click to return on the top page