Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Teaching Techniques - Students with Special Needs and Limited English Proficiency
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Afzali, Carr, Frick, A. Kelly, Serafini, Summers, A. Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to ensure that certified teachers receive adequate instruction in techniques for teaching students with special needs and students with limited English proficiency and in appropriate behavior interventions; applying the Act to teachers certified at specified times; and requiring the Department to adopt regulations.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0995
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-122 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM