Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Information on Payouts
Sponsored by
Delegates Olszewski, Arora, Bromwell, DeBoy, Elliott, Frank, Frick, Krebs, Reznik, Sophocleus, Stocksdale, M. Washington, Weir, Wood, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that regulations adopted by the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission include provisions that require specified gaming payouts to be reported to the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency in a report that contains specified information; and requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency to forward the report to the Department of Human Resources Child Support Enforcement Administration for the purpose of enforcing specified child support orders.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 3/05/2013 3/06/2013 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM