Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Week - School Supplies
Sponsored by
Delegates Hogan, Aumann, Boteler, Bromwell, Cane, Cardin, Clagett, DeBoy, Eckardt, Elliott, Frush, George, Glass, Glenn, Guzzone, Haddaway-Riccio, Hershey, Hough, Jacobs, K. Kelly, Lafferty, McComas, McDermott, McDonough, O'Donnell, Olszewski, Otto, Ready, B. Robinson, Schulz, Smigiel, Sophocleus, Vitale, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilson, and Wood
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified sales and use tax exemption to include any school supply with a taxable price of $100 or less during a designated sales tax-free period for back-to-school shopping, subject to specified limitations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-228 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM