Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Moratorium and Study on Advanced Metering Infrastructure MC/PG 101-19
Sponsored by
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission from implementing certain advanced metering infrastructure; and requiring the Department of Legislative Services to conduct a study comparing the costs and benefits of implementing advanced metering infrastructure or automatic meter reading by public water utilities and report its findings to the General Assembly on or before September 30, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Moratorium and Study on Advanced Metering Infrastructure MC/PG 101-19
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-101, 28-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM