Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of State Police - Police Employees - Residency Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates DeBoy, Barkley, Beidle, Frick, Lafferty, B. Robinson, and Sophocleus
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the residency requirements for police employees of the Department of State Police to allow an appointee to reside within 25 miles outside the State borders and requiring an appointee to be a resident of the State or reside within 25 miles outside its borders for the duration of the appointee's employment.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1213 Session: 2010 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM