Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student and Workforce Data Linkage - Extension of Time Limit
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser (By Request - Maryland Longitudinal Data System) and Delegates Atterbeary, Barkley, Buckel, Chang, Ebersole, Jackson, Lafferty, Luedtke, McComas, McCray, Patterson, Rose, Shoemaker, Tarlau, M. Washington, and West
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 791
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending from 5 years to 20 years the length of time that student data and workforce data used by the Maryland Longitudinal Data System is limited to being linked beyond the date of latest attendance in any educational institution in the State; prohibiting the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center from selling specified protected information; and prohibiting the Center from charging specified fees.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1165
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {223929/1 (Delegate Fisher)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (48-86)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {523523/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (46-88)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until after Third Reading calendar (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {123423/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-37)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {294633/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-42)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 791
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Text - First - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student and Workforce Data Linkage - Extension of Time Limit
House 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable Adopted 38
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Fisher) Adopted 38
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Floor Amendment {223929/1 (Delegate Fisher) 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Floor Amendment (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (48-86) 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Floor Amendment {523523/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (46-88) 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until after Third Reading calendar (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 40
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {123423/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 41
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student and Workforce Data Linkage - Extension of Time Limit
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (100-37) 43
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {294633/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (94-42) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student and Workforce Data Linkage - Extension of Time Limit
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 791
Text - Chapter - Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Student and Workforce Data Linkage - Extension of Time Limit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-702, 24-703 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM