Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Invest Maryland Program - Alteration of Program Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Fisher, Afzali, Dwyer, George, Myers, and Serafini
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirements of the Invest Maryland Program regarding the allocation and use of designated capital by specified venture firms, the Enterprise Fund, the Rural Maryland Council, and the Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority; repealing the Maryland Venture Fund Authority in the Department of Business and Economic Development; repealing all duties of the Authority; requiring the Department to allocate designated capital in equal amounts to the economic development unit of each county; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-501, 6-504 through 6-506, 6-504 through 6-508, 6-511, 6-511 through 6-514, 6-514, 6-517 through 6-523, 6-526 through 6-529 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM