Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Magnetic Resonance Imaging Services and Computed Tomography Scan Services - Patient Referrals
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, under specified circumstances, a health care practitioner to refer or direct specified other persons to refer a patient for magnetic resonance imaging services or computed tomography scan services to a health care entity to which the patient otherwise could not be referred under a specified provision of law; requiring a health care practitioner, under specified circumstances, to include specified information in the written notice required under a specified provision of law; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-302, 1-302.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM