Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Coverage for Loss Caused by Water Damage
Sponsored by
Delegate Jameson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring insurers that issue, sell, or deliver policies of homeowner's insurance to make available, rather than to offer in writing at specified times, coverage for loss that is caused by specified water damage under specified circumstances; requiring the coverage to be made available in the amount of at least $5,000; authorizing insurers that make specified coverage available to offer specified other coverage in a specified amount, notwithstanding any other law or regulation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0435
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM