Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Barve, DeBoy, and Krebs
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the day on which interest begins to accrue on specified taxpayer refunds of specified tax payments; requiring a tax collector to pay interest on specified taxpayer refunds beginning on the date of the overpayment if the overpayment is attributable to an error or a mistake of the State or a unit of the State government; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0423
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/31/2014 Text - First - Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM