Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Baltimore City - Franklin Entrepreneurial and Apprenticeship Center
Sponsored by
Delegate Haynes
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to extend the deadline to June 1, 2015, for the Board of Directors of the Druid Heights Community Development Corporation to present evidence of specified matching funds for specified grants for the Franklin Entrepreneurial and Apprenticeship Center,located in Baltimore City; and providing that the grants may not terminate before June 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2010, 2012 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM