Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Sponsored by
Delegates Stein, Barve, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Healey, Holmes, and Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the use of certain cost-sharing funds to fund a conservation practice that does not meet certain requirements; authorizing certain cost-sharing funds to be made available for certain fixed natural filter practices; prohibiting basing a reduction in certain cost-sharing rates on tons of soil saved or an amortization formula; requiring that certain cost-sharing funds be based on a certain rate; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0597
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Agriculture - Cost-Sharing Program - Fixed Natural Filter Practices
House 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/23/2020 3:22 PM