Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Barnes, Braveboy, Cane, Costa, Cullison, Frush, Healey, Hubbard, A. Kelly, Kipke, Lafferty, McIntosh, Morhaim, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Ready, Reznik, Sophocleus, Swain, Tarrant, V. Turner, Vaughn, Hammen, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Donoghue, Elliott, Frank, Krebs, and McDonough
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council; providing for the membership of the Council; requiring the Governor to consider the geographic and demographic diversity of the State in appointing individuals to the Council; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Secretary of Aging or their designees to cochair the Council; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, with assistance from the Department of Aging, to provide staff support for the Council; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0679
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {986087/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {986087/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48A
Senate 3/19/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Finance 48
Senate 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3101 through 13-3106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM