Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Department of Education - Lacrosse Opportunities Program - Youth Lacrosse Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsored by
Delegates Walker, Mosby, Ali, A. Washington, C. Howard, Ebersole, Patterson, Rose, Tarlau, Afzali, Hixson, and Turner
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a youth lacrosse nonprofit organization to submit an application for a grant under the Lacrosse Opportunities Program; requiring the State Superintendent of Schools or the State Superintendent's designee to provide grants to eligible youth lacrosse nonprofit organizations with programs that will increase opportunities for minority students to participate in lacrosse; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {245761/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (9-33)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Department of Education - Lacrosse Opportunities Program - Youth Lacrosse Nonprofit Organizations
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {245761/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - State Department of Education - Lacrosse Opportunities Program - Youth Lacrosse Nonprofit Organizations
House 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 42
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator DeGrange) Adopted 55
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 57
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Motion Special Order until 4/7 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted 60
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (9-33) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Text - Chapter - State Department of Education - Lacrosse Opportunities Program - Youth Lacrosse Nonprofit Organizations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM