Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Identification of Students With Traumatic Brain Injury - Study and Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner, Boteler, Cain, Feldmark, Guyton, Ivey, Kaiser, Luedtke, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, and Patterson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, the State Department of Education, and the State Traumatic Brain Injury Advisory Board jointly to study the underidentification of traumatic brain injuries among school-age children and to recommend a process to identify children with existing traumatic brain injuries in schools; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health, the State Department of Education, and the State Traumatic Brain Injury Advisory Board to report their findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2020.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0778
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1530 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Identification of Students With Traumatic Brain Injury - Study and Report
House 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Education - Identification of Students With Traumatic Brain Injury - Study and Report
House 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 38
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM