Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - General Authority
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, DeBoy, Branch, Braveboy, Clippinger, Conaway, Hixson, Holmes, Howard, Ivey, Jones, McIntosh, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Tarrant, V. Turner, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a health occupation board to adopt regulations requiring applicants for an initial license or certificate to have a criminal history records check; authorizing a health occupation board to adopt regulations requiring applicants for reinstatement of a lapsed license or certificate, removal from inactive status, or renewal of a license or certificate to have a criminal history records check; requiring an applicant to submit specified fingerprints and fees to obtain a criminal history records check; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/04/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/01/2013 2/04/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM