Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Evidence of Required Security - Carrying While Operating Vehicle
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Atterbeary, Barkley, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Krebs, Luedtke, McComas, W. Miller, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the operator of a motor vehicle to carry evidence of specified required security on paper or in an electronic format when operating the motor vehicle; providing that the operator of a moped or motor scooter may carry evidence of a specified required security on paper or in an electronic format; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2015 3/16/2015 Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-104.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM