Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Innovative Idea Awards Program - Additional Cash Awards
Sponsored by
Delegates C. Wilson, Atterbeary, Bromwell, Brooks, Carozza, Chang, Hayes, Knotts, Krimm, Lafferty, McConkey, McMillan, W. Miller, Moon, Morales, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, and Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a specified additional cash award provided to specified State employees under the Innovative Idea Awards Program for innovative ideas shall be equal to 10% of the savings or gain to the State from the innovative idea; and repealing the limit on the amount of the cash award.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1336 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2015 2/12/2015 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM