Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Estate Appraisers - Appraisal Agreement - Required Copies
Sponsored by
Delegates Vaughn, D. Barnes, Barron, Fennell, C. Howard, Impallaria, Jameson, Valentino-Smith, and Vallario
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a licensed real estate appraiser or a certified real estate appraiser to attach a copy of the appraisal agreement to the written appraisal report prepared in accordance with the appraisal agreement and to each additional copy of the written appraisal report; and defining the term "appraisal agreement".
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0568
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533895/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments {533895/1 Report Adopted 43A
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43A
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Finance 45
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM