Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Substitution and Dispensing - Interchangeable Biological Products
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Kelly, Kipke, Oaks, Reznik, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist to substitute an interchangeable biological product for specified prescribed products only under specified circumstances; requiring a pharmacist or a specified designee of a pharmacist to inform retail consumers of the availability of a interchangeable biological product and the approximate cost difference as compared to the brand name drug; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0537
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-504, 12-504.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM