Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsored by
The Speaker and Delegates Hixson, F. Turner, Beidle, Bohanan, Branch, Bromwell, Cane, Cardin, Clagett, Clippinger, Conway, Davis, DeBoy, Dumais, Frick, Gaines, Gilchrist, Griffith, Gutierrez, Guzzone, Hammen, Haynes, Healey, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Ivey, James, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Kramer, Lafferty, Lee, Malone, McHale, McIntosh, A. Miller, Mitchell, Murphy, Olszewski, Pendergrass, B. Robinson, Rudolph, Simmons, Stein, Stukes, Tarrant, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Walker, Wilson, Zucker, Serafini, Afzali, Arentz, Aumann, Barve, Bates, Beitzel, Cluster, Dwyer, Eckardt, Elliott, Frank, George, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, Hough, Jacobs, Kipke, Krebs, McComas, McConkey, McDermott, McDonough, Myers, Norman, Otto, Parrott, Ready, Schuh, Schulz, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the size of an estate required to file an estate tax return; altering a certain limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax; repealing a specified limit on the unified credit used for determining the Maryland estate tax for decedents dying before January 1, 2019; and altering a specified limit on the amount of the Maryland estate tax.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0602
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {335969/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-14)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-10)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable with Amendments {335969/1 Report Adopted 42
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (119-14) 43
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 41A
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/18/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (36-10) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-305, 7-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM