Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Beidle, Barnes, Barve, Bobo, Bohanan, Branch, Braveboy, Bromwell, Busch, Cane, Carter, Clagett, Conway, Cullison, Davis, DeBoy, Donoghue, Dumais, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Griffith, Guzzone, Hammen, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Hubbard, James, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Lafferty, Love, Luedtke, Malone, McHale, McIntosh, A. Miller, Niemann, Oaks, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, B. Robinson, Rudolph, Sophocleus, Stein, F. Turner, V. Turner, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, Weir, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Cybersecurity Investment Fund in the Maryland Technology Development Corporation as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Corporation to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; specifying the purpose for which the Fund may be used; providing for the investment of money in and expenditures from the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0603
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803499/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Special Order until 2/27 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-41)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/24/2014 2/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {803499/1 Report Adopted 36
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Special Order until 2/27 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 36
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Third Reading Passed (95-41) 40
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 First Reading Finance 39
Senate 3/11/2014 3/11/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-463 through 10-465 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM