Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Bohanan, Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Branch, Braveboy, Bromwell, Busch, Cane, Carter, Clagett, Conway, Cullison, Davis, DeBoy, Donoghue, Dumais, Frick, Gaines, Griffith, Guzzone, Hammen, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Hubbard, James, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Lafferty, Luedtke, Malone, McHale, McIntosh, A. Miller, Murphy, Oaks, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, B. Robinson, Rudolph, Sophocleus, Stein, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Weir, Wilson, Wood, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program; establishing a Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund and a Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Fund Authority in the Department of Business and Economic Development; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill specified appropriations to the Fund for specified fiscal years; providing for the membership and duties of the Authority; providing for the duties of the Department in connection with the Program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0601
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {725362/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-31)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {725362/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (103-31) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 65
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-601 through 6-623 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM