Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Walker, Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Bohanan, Branch, Braveboy, Bromwell, Busch, Cane, Cardin, Carter, Clagett, Conway, Cullison, Davis, DeBoy, Donoghue, Dumais, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Griffith, Guzzone, Hammen, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Howard, Hubbard, Ivey, James, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Lafferty, Luedtke, Malone, McHale, McIntosh, A. Miller, Morhaim, Niemann, Oaks, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, B. Robinson, Rudolph, Stein, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, Weir, Wilson, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone Program; authorizing specified educational institutions that meet specified criteria to apply to the Secretary of Business and Economic Development to be designated as a qualified institution; requiring the Secretary to approve or reject an application for designation as a qualified institution within 90 days after the application is submitted; requiring county and municipal corporations to provide specified property tax credits for entities locating in a zone; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0600
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {735969/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {735969/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 65
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/30/2014 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-201, 12-203, 12-207, 12-208, 12-209, 12-210, 12-211, 5-102, 5-1401 through 5-1407 )
(   10-702 )
(   9-103, 9-103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM