Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Forms - Graphical Representation of General Fund Expenditures
Sponsored by
Delegates Clagett, Barnes, Barve, Beidle, Bohanan, Branch, Braveboy, Bromwell, Busch, Cane, Carr, Carter, Conway, Cullison, Davis, DeBoy, Donoghue, Dumais, Frick, Gaines, Griffith, Guzzone, Hammen, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, Hubbard, James, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, A. Kelly, Lafferty, Luedtke, Malone, McHale, McIntosh, A. Miller, Oaks, Olszewski, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Proctor, B. Robinson, Rudolph, Stein, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, Weir, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to include on specified tax forms a demonstrative representation of how much of each dollar that the General Fund receives is spent on specified categories; providing that the representation may be in graphical or pictorial form; requiring the Comptroller to post the representation on the Comptroller's Web site and to include it in specified instructions on the Web site; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0604
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Frick) {953225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/31/2014 2/03/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable 46
House 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Hixson) Adopted 46
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Frick) {953225/1 Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 48A
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 57
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM